NH HB292 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-30 - House Lay on the Table (Rep Swinford): Motion Adopted Division Vote 331-17; House Journal 34, PG.1094
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to securities regulation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to securities regulation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-30 House Lay on the Table (Rep Swinford): Motion Adopted Division Vote 331-17; House Journal 34, PG.1094
2011-03-22 House Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 27, PG.815-816
2011-03-22 House Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #2011-1126h; House Calendar 27, PG.843
2011-03-22 House Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1126h for Mar 30 (Vote 10-6; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 27, PG.815-816
2011-03-15 House Public Hearing: 3/22/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 ==Executive Session to Follow==
2011-02-23 House Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 21, PG.458
2011-02-23 House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0196h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.456-458
2011-02-23 House Amendment #0196h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.456-458
2011-02-17 House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-0196h; House Calendar 15, PG.301-303
2011-02-17 House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0196h for Feb 23 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 15, PG.267
2011-02-02 House Executive Session: 2/15/2011 Legislative Office Building 302 3:00 PM or Immediately Following House Session
2011-02-01 House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/10/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2011-01-25 House Public Hearing: 2/1/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2011-01-20 House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 11, PG. 180

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback