NH HB291 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/16/2017; Chapter 128; Eff. 8/15/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/16/2017; Chapter 128; Eff. 8/15/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removing veterinarians from the requirements of adopting rules for prescribing opioids and querying the controlled drug prescription health and safety program.
Title
Removing veterinarians from the requirements of adopting rules for prescribing opioids and querying the controlled drug prescription health and safety program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/16/2017; Chapter 128; Eff. 8/15/2017 |
2017-06-01 | House | Enrolled 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 127 |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/31/2017); Senate Journal 19 |
2017-05-18 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1625s (Rep. John T. O'Connor): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/18/2017 House Journal 16 P. 6 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-1625s, Regular Calendar 21Y-2N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/11/2017; Senate Journal 16 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment #2017-1625s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/11/2017; Senate Journal 16 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1625s, 05/11/2017; Senate Calendar 22 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Hearing: 04/25/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:00 pm, on proposed amendment #2017-1477s; Senate Calendar 20 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Hearing: 04/18/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 19 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Introduced 02/16/2017 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 7 |
2017-02-15 | House | Referral Waived by Committee Chair per House Rule 46(f) 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 37 |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 11 |
2017-02-15 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0321h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 11 |
2017-02-15 | House | Amendment #2017-0321h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 11 |
2017-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0321h (NT) for 02/15/2017 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 10 |
2017-02-08 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2017 Legislative Office Building 303 |
2017-01-25 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 01/31/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2017-01-19 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 01/24/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2017-01-11 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 01/24/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2017-01-06 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 3 P. 7 |