NH HB290 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 322-9; House Journal 29, PG.978-980
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 322-9; House Journal 29, PG.978-980
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting unlicensed persons from openly carrying a pistol or revolver in a public building.
Title
Prohibiting unlicensed persons from openly carrying a pistol or revolver in a public building.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-21 - House - ITL (Y: 322 N: 9 NV: 27 Abs: 39) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 322-9; House Journal 29, PG.978-980 |
2013-03-01 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 20 (Vote 14-4; Part II, Regular Calendar); House Calendar 23 PG.587 |
2013-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 2/28/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-02-13 | House | Public Hearing: 2/21/2013 10:00 Amendment Representatives Hall |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 12, PG.190 |