NH HB279 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Signed by the Governor on 6/8/2015; Chapter 122; Section 2 Effective Date 11/1/2016, Remaining Effective Date 6/8/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Signed by the Governor on 6/8/2015; Chapter 122; Section 2 Effective Date 11/1/2016, Remaining Effective Date 6/8/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to study the economic impact of the arts and culture in New Hampshire.
Title
Establishing a commission to study the economic impact of the arts and culture in New Hampshire.
Sponsors
Rep. Kenneth Gidge [D] | Rep. Lee Guerette [D] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Rep. Frederick Rice [R] |
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - House - Ought to Pass Amended (Y: 174 N: 121 NV: 102 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-11 | House | Signed by the Governor on 6/8/2015; Chapter 122; Section 2 Effective Date 11/1/2016, Remaining Effective Date 6/8/2015 |
2015-05-21 | House | Enrolled (in recess of 5/6/2015); House Journal 41, PG. 1782 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 5/21/2015); Senate Journal 16 |
2015-05-19 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2015-1707EBA: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of 5/6/2015); House Journal 41, PG. 1780 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #1707e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 5/14/2015); Senate Journal 15 |
2015-05-06 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1285s (Rep A. Christie): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG. 1747 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1285s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 11 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Sen. Fuller Clark Floor Amendment #2015-1285s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 11 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/9/15; Senate Calendar 16 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Hearing: 3/31/15, Room 103, State House, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 15 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0650h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 174-121; House Journal 24, PG. 885-557 |
2015-03-11 | House | Amendment #0650h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 885 |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0650h for Mar 11 (Vote 12-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 424 |
2015-02-24 | House | Executive Session: 3/2/2015 12:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2015-01-26 | House | ==RESCHEDULED==Public Hearing: 1/28/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2015-01-21 | House | ==POSTPONED== Public Hearing: 1/27/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 12, PG. 215 |