NH HB272 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB272

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-22 - Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; 04/22/2021; Senate Journal 12
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the labeling and sale of hemp products containing CBD.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the labeling and sale of hemp products containing CBD.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22SenateRereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; 04/22/2021; Senate Journal 12
2021-04-14SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 04/22/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 20
2021-04-08SenateRemote Hearing: 04/13/2021, 09:15 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 19
2021-04-07SenateIntroduced 04/01/2021 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 11
2021-04-07HouseReconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50
2021-04-07HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0405h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 18
2021-04-07HouseAmendment # 2021-0405h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 18
2021-02-18HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0405h (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 11
2021-01-20HousePublic Hearing: 01/27/2021 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following links:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92887623403 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-09HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 2 P. 41

Same As/Similar To

HB272 (Carry Over) 2021-04-22 - Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; 04/22/2021; Senate Journal 12

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback