NH HB271 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-07 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/24/2021; Chapter 223; Eff: 08/24/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-07 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/24/2021; Chapter 223; Eff: 08/24/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to standards for per and polyfluoroalkyl substances (PFAS) in drinking water and ambient groundwater.
Title
Relative to standards for per and polyfluoroalkyl substances (PFAS) in drinking water and ambient groundwater.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-07 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 08/24/2021; Chapter 223; Eff: 08/24/2021 |
2021-07-23 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021 |
2021-07-21 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-07-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-2068eba: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 06/24/2021 House Journal 11 |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-2068e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-24 | House | Conference Committee Report 2021-2003c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/24/2021 |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2021-2003c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/24/2021; Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2021-2003c; 06/24/2021 |
2021-06-15 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 06/15/2021 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Avard, Gray, Watters; 06/10/2021; Senate Journal 19 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Sen. Avard Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/10/2021; Senate Journal 19 |
2021-06-07 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2021-1780s and Requests CofC (Reps. Renzullo, Suzanne Smith, Gunski, Healey): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/04/2021 House Journal 9 P. 51 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-1780s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/20/2021; Senate Journal 17 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2021-1780s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/20/2021; Senate Journal 17 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/27/2021; Senate Calendar 25 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Special Order to Next Session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/20/2021; Senate Journal 16 |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/20/2021; Senate Calendar 24A |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 05/03/2021, 01:30 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 22 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Introduced 04/01/2021 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 11 |
2021-04-07 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50 |
2021-04-07 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0577h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 46 |
2021-04-07 | House | Amendment # 2021-0577h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 46 |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0577h (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 22 |
2021-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 02/03/2021 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following linkTo join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92220129569 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 2 P. 41 |