NH HB271 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Signed by the Governor on 6/2/2015; Chapter 65; Effective Date 6/2/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to possession and administration of an opioid antagonist for opioid-related overdoses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to possession and administration of an opioid antagonist for opioid-related overdoses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-03HouseSigned by the Governor on 6/2/2015; Chapter 65; Effective Date 6/2/2015
2015-05-19HouseEnrolled (in recess of 5/6/2015); House Journal 41, PG. 1781
2015-05-19SenateEnrolled (In recess 5/14/2015); Senate Journal 15
2015-05-07SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 13
2015-04-29SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/7/15; Senate Calendar 20
2015-04-15SenateHearing: 4/21/15, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 18
2015-03-12SenateIntroduced and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 9
2015-02-18HouseOught to Pass with Amendment #0112h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG. 501
2015-02-18HouseAmendment #0112h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG. 501
2015-02-10HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0112h for Feb 18 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar13, PG. 240
2015-02-10HouseExecutive Session: 2/5/2015 3:30 PM Legislative Office Building 205
2015-01-21HousePublic Hearing: 1/29/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205
2015-01-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 12, PG. 215

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback