NH HB270 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2021; Chapter 49; Eff: 07/24/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to post-conviction DNA testing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to post-conviction DNA testing.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-27HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 05/25/2021; Chapter 49; Eff: 07/24/2021
2021-05-17SenateEnrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/13/2021); Senate Journal 16
2021-05-17HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 04/09/2021
2021-05-06HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-1285e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 04/09/2021
2021-05-06SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-1285e Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Amendment Adopted, (In recess of 05/06/2021); Senate Journal 15
2021-04-29SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/29/2021; Senate Journal 13
2021-04-21SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/29/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 21
2021-04-08SenateRemote Hearing: 04/13/2021, 01:45 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 19
2021-04-07SenateIntroduced 04/01/2021 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 11
2021-04-07HouseReconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50
2021-04-07HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 7
2021-03-02HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 6
2021-02-26HousePublic Hearing: 02/26/2021 09:45 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92701022260 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-09HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 2 P. 41

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback