NH HB270 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/02/2017 House Journal 5 P. 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/02/2017 House Journal 5 P. 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study suspensions and expulsions in middle and high schools.
Title
Establishing a committee to study suspensions and expulsions in middle and high schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Gile [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-02 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/02/2017 House Journal 5 P. 12 |
2017-01-24 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2017-01-24 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/02/2017 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 8 |
2017-01-11 | House | Executive Session: 01/19/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2017 02:15 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2016-12-30 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 22 |