NH HB270 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.307
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.307
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Making an appropriation to the department of education to fund career and technical student organizations.
Title
Making an appropriation to the department of education to fund career and technical student organizations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.307 |
2013-01-30 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 6 (Vote 24-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 11, PG.154 |
2013-01-22 | House | Executive Session: 1/30/2013 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2013-01-22 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 1/30/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2013-01-17 | House | Public Hearing: 1/29/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Finance; House Journal 12, PG.189 |