NH HB265 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB265
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 55
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 55
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the collection of sales taxes of foreign jurisdictions by New Hampshire businesses.
Title
Relative to the collection of sales taxes of foreign jurisdictions by New Hampshire businesses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 55 |
2019-11-13 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 15 |
2019-10-22 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 11/05/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive Session: 11/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-09-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/26/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-03-13 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-02-13 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/21/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-01-23 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/05/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-01-16 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 01/22/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-12-28 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 2 P. 43 |
Same As/Similar To
HB265 (Carry Over) 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar)