NH HB264 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-15 - Retained in Committee
Pending: House Health, Human Services & Elderly Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to amendments and corrections to birth records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to amendments and corrections to birth records.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-15HouseRetained in Committee
2023-02-02HouseExecutive Session: 02/08/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211
2023-01-26HouseExecutive Session: 02/02/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211
2023-01-25HousePublic Hearing: 02/01/2023 09:45 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2023-01-09HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback