NH HB260 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2019; Chapter 124; Eff: 06/25/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2019; Chapter 124; Eff: 06/25/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the purging of motor vehicle violations.
Title
Relative to the purging of motor vehicle violations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2019; Chapter 124; Eff: 06/25/2019 |
2019-05-31 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 51 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/30/2019); Senate Journal 19 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/15/2019; Senate Calendar 22 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Hearing: 05/09/2019, Room 100, State House, 11:00 am; Senate Calendar 21 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/07/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-01-31 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/31/2019 House Journal 4 P. 5 |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 01/31/2019 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 5 |
2019-01-16 | House | Executive Session: 01/22/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/15/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2018-12-28 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Transportation House Journal 2 P. 43 |