NH HB260 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - II. Remainder Effective 09/22/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - II. Remainder Effective 09/22/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the children in need of services (CHINS) program, relative to court-ordered placements in shelter care facilities and at the youth development center and requiring a report on the uses of the Sununu Youth Services Center.
Title
Relative to the children in need of services (CHINS) program, relative to court-ordered placements in shelter care facilities and at the youth development center and requiring a report on the uses of the Sununu Youth Services Center.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-26 - Senate - Committee of Conference Report 2135CofC (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - House - AM 0968H(NT) (Y: 215 N: 138 NV: 32 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - House - AM 0968H(NT) (Y: 215 N: 138 NV: 32 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-25 | House | II. Remainder Effective 09/22/2013 |
2013-07-25 | House | I. Section 1-15 Effective 09/01/2013 |
2013-07-25 | House | Signed By Governor 07/24/2013; Chapter 0249 |
2013-06-26 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 52, PG.1716 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2013-2193e(NT) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 52, PG.1714 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2193e, New Title, Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-26 | House | Conference Committee Report #2135c Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 52, PG.1693 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 2135c; Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Adopted |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Conference Committee Report #2013-2135c; Senate Amendment + New Amendment, Filed |
2013-06-12 | House | Committee of Conference Meeting: 6/19/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Stiles, Odell, Kelly |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Sen. Stiles Moved Accede to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-12 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps Walz, Long, Gargasz, and K.Rogers [Recess of 6/5/13]; House Journal 49, PG.1650 |
2013-06-12 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment #1568s, #1642s, #1875s, and #1971s(NT) and Requests C of C (Rep Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote [Recess of 6/5/13]; House Journal 49, PG.1650 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1971s New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1971s New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-1971s New Title, 6/6/13; Senate Calendar 23 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 1568s, 1642s, 1875s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Sen. Odell Floor Amendment #2013-1875s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Sen. Stiles Floor Amendment #2013-1642s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1568s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-1568s, 5/23/13; Senate Calendar 21 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Hearing: 4/16/13, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 16 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Health, Education & Human Services |
2013-03-27 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0968h(NT): Motion Adopted Division Vote 211-140; House Journal 31, PG.1051-1057 |
2013-03-27 | House | Amendment #0968h(NT): Amendment Adopted Regular Calendar 215-138; House Journal 31, PG.1051-1057 |
2013-03-20 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-0968h (New Title); House Calendar 25, PG.724-728 |
2013-03-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0968h(NT) for Mar 27 (Vote 16-7; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 25, PG.709 |
2013-03-12 | House | Executive Session: 3/19/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2013-03-12 | House | Division III Work Session: 3/18/2013 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2013-03-11 | House | Division III Work Session: 3/14/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to Finance; House Journal 24, PG.665-667 |
2013-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0447h(NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG.665-667 |
2013-03-06 | House | Amendment #0447h(NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG.665-667 |
2013-02-20 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-0447h (New Title); House Calendar 20, PG.444-446 |
2013-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0447h(NT) for Mar 6 (Vote 19-0; Part I Regular Calendar); House Calendar 20, PG.415 |
2013-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 2/19/2013 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2013-02-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/14/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2013-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 2/5/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 206 ==TIME CHANGE (Orig 1:00 PM)== |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Children and Family Law; House Journal 12, PG.189 |