NH HB258 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/18/2017; Chapter 238; Eff. 9/16/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/18/2017; Chapter 238; Eff. 9/16/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the submission and approval of subsurface sewage disposal system plans, relative to septic requirements in conversions to accessory dwellings, and authorizing certain septage and sludge land applications.
Title
Relative to the submission and approval of subsurface sewage disposal system plans, relative to septic requirements in conversions to accessory dwellings, and authorizing certain septage and sludge land applications.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-20 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/18/2017; Chapter 238; Eff. 9/16/2017 |
2017-07-05 | House | Enrolled 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 27 |
2017-07-03 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/22/2017); Senate Journal 20 |
2017-06-22 | House | Conference Committee Report 2292c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 21 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Conference Committee Report #2017-2292c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/22/2017; Senate Journal 20 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, #2017-2292c; 06/15/2017 |
2017-06-08 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 06/13/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2017-06-08 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Avard, Bradley, Feltes; 06/08/2017; Senate Journal 19 |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Sen. Avard Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/08/2017; Senate Journal 19 |
2017-06-08 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Mullen, Renzullo, McConnell, Suzanne Smith 06/08/2017 House Journal 18 P. 2 |
2017-06-08 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1981s and Requests CofC (Rep. Christensen): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/08/2017 House Journal 18 P. 2 |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-1981s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/31/2017; Senate Journal 18 |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment #2017-1981s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/31/2017; Senate Journal 18 |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Special Order HB 258 to after the House Messagess, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/31/2017; Senate Journal 18 |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Special Order HB 258 to the end of the calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/31/2017; Senate Journal 18 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1981s, 05/31/2017; Senate Calendar 25 |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Hearing: 04/25/2017, Room 103, State House, 09:15 am, on proposed amendment #2017-1472s; Senate Calendar 20 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Hearing: 03/28/2017, Room 103, State House, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 16 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Introduced 02/16/2017 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 7 |
2017-02-15 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 19 |
2017-02-06 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/15/2017 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 14 |
2017-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 02/01/2017 Legislative Office Building 305 |
2017-01-04 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2016-12-30 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 2 P. 22 |