NH HB258 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-18 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 8 (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-18 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 8 (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the taking of deer from baited areas.
Title
Prohibiting the taking of deer from baited areas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-18 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 8 (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar) |
2013-10-21 | House | Retained Bill- Executive Session: 11/7/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-09-11 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/26/2013 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-03-05 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | Executive Session: 3/5/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-02-20 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/28/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 |
2013-02-15 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/20/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 2/7/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources; House Journal 12, PG.189 |