NH HB254 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the provision allowing operators to retain a portion of meals and rooms taxes collected and the appropriation of meals and rooms tax revenues to school building aid.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the provision allowing operators to retain a portion of meals and rooms taxes collected and the appropriation of meals and rooms tax revenues to school building aid.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 24
2019-02-14HouseSpecial Order to 2/27/2019 Without Objection House Journal 5 P. 77
2019-02-14HouseRemoved from Consent (Rep. Cahill) 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 5
2019-02-06HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/14/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 12
2019-01-23HouseExecutive Session: 01/29/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202
2019-01-16HouseFull Committee Work Session: 01/22/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202
2019-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 01/16/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 2 P. 43

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback