NH HB254 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Signed by the Governor on 6/5/2015; Chapter 86; Effective Date 1/1/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Signed by the Governor on 6/5/2015; Chapter 86; Effective Date 1/1/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to exceptions to restrictions on boating.
Title
Relative to exceptions to restrictions on boating.
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Byron [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-11 | House | Signed by the Governor on 6/5/2015; Chapter 86; Effective Date 1/1/2016 |
2015-05-13 | House | Enrolled (in recess of 5/6/2015); House Journal 41, PG. 1779 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 5/7/2015); Senate Journal 14 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/30/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Hearing: 4/8/15, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 16 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 9 |
2015-02-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0180h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG. 305 |
2015-02-11 | House | Adopt Amendment #0180h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG. 305 |
2015-02-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0180h for Feb 11 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar11, PG. 176 |
2015-02-04 | House | Executive Session: 2/4/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 |
2015-01-26 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/28/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2015-01-21 | House | ==POSTPONED== Public Hearing: 1/27/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 12, PG. 214 |