NH HB251 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/16/2017; Chapter 127; Eff. 8/15/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/16/2017; Chapter 127; Eff. 8/15/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to capital reserve fund appropriations by municipalities.
Title
Relative to capital reserve fund appropriations by municipalities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/16/2017; Chapter 127; Eff. 8/15/2017 |
2017-05-17 | House | Enrolled 05/04/2017 House Journal 15 P. 48 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/11/2017); Senate Journal 17 |
2017-05-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2017-1573e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/20/2017 House Journal 14 P. 26 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2017-1573e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 04/27/2017); Senate Journal 16 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/20/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Hearing: 03/22/2017, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Introduced 02/16/2017 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 7 |
2017-02-15 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0231h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 18 |
2017-02-15 | House | Amendment #2017-0231h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 18 |
2017-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0231h for 02/15/2017 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 13 |
2017-02-10 | House | Executive Session: 02/01/2017 Legislative Office Building 301 |
2017-01-26 | House | ==CONTINUED== Subcommittee Work Session: 01/31/2017 09:45 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2017-01-26 | House | ==RECESSED== Subcommittee Work Session: 01/26/2017 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2017-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2016-12-30 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 2 P. 22 |