NH HB250 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB250

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-29 - Vetoed by Governor Sununu 07/28/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a dental benefit under the state Medicaid program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a dental benefit under the state Medicaid program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-01 - House - Concur (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 351 Abs: 38) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-29HouseVetoed by Governor Sununu 07/28/2020
2020-07-10HouseEnrolled 06/30/2020 House Journal 10
2020-07-10SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9
2020-06-30HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Weber): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 205-124 06/30/2020
2020-06-16SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-1427s, Regular Calendar 19Y-5N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-06-16SenateCommittee Amendment # 2020-1427s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-06-10SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1427s, 06/16/2020; Senate Calendar 23
2020-06-05SenateThe following email will be monitored throughout the meeting by someone who can assist with and alert the committee to any technical issues: remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us or call (603-271-3043). Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate6. To view/listen to this hearing on YouTube, use this link: https://www.youtube.com/channel/UCjBZdtrjRnQdmg-2MPMiWrA Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate5. Webinar ID: 997 1560 0870 Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate4. Or iPhone one-tap: 9292056099,,99715600870# or 13017158592,,99715600870# Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate3. To listen via telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): 1-301-715-8592, or 1-312-626-6799 or 1-929-205-6099, or 1-253-215-8782, or 1-346-248-7799, or 1-669-900-6833 Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate2. To submit your testimony to the committee, please send all documents via email to remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate1. To sign-in and/or speak in support or opposition, please register in advance by using this link: https://www.zoom.us/webinar/register/WN_DhzI7U5vQRi3zvou0MN6ow Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05SenateMembers of the public may attend using the following links: Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05SenateCommittee members will receive secure Zoom invitations via email. Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05SenateRemote Hearing: 06/10/2020, 09:15 am, on proposed amendment # 2020-1372s; Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05SenateRemote Hearing: 06/10/2020, 09:10 am; Senate Calendar 22
2020-03-12SenateIntroduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 7
2020-01-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-2725h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 47
2020-01-08HouseAmendment # 2019-2725h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 47
2019-11-13HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2725h (NT) (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 50
2019-10-22HouseExecutive Session: 11/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-09-13HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 09/24/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-02-27HouseRetained in Committee
2019-02-20HouseExecutive Session: 02/26/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-02-13House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/19/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 01/17/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 205
2018-12-27HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 2 P. 43

Same As/Similar To

HB250 (Carry Over) 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2725h (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar)

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback