NH HB249 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Lay on Table (Rep. Butler): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Lay on Table (Rep. Butler): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting restaurant owners to allow dogs in restaurants.
Title
Permitting restaurant owners to allow dogs in restaurants.
Sponsors
Rep. Katherine Rogers [D] | Rep. Timothy Horrigan [D] | Rep. Patricia Klee [D] | Rep. Skip Rollins [R] |
Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] | Rep. Peter Leishman [D] | Rep. Thomas Schamberg [D] | Rep. Kristina Schultz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Butler): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 9 |
2019-02-26 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2019-02-26 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/07/2019 (Vote 14-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 7 |
2019-02-07 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/13/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-02-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-29 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/06/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/06/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-15 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 01/22/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-15 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/22/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 2 P. 43 |