NH HB249 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on February 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-16 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 19, PG.415
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on February 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-16 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 19, PG.415
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to procedures for property revaluations.
Title
Relative to procedures for property revaluations.
Sponsors
Sen. John Barnes [R] | Rep. Timothy Comerford [R] | Rep. Daniel Itse [R] | Rep. Clifford Newton [R] |
Rep. Kathleen Souza [R] | Rep. James Sullivan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-16 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 19, PG.415 | |
2011-02-15 | House Special Order to Feb 16: Motion Adopted Without Objection; House Journal 17, PG.378 | |
2011-02-10 | House Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass; House Calendar 13, PG.235-236 | |
2011-02-10 | House Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 15 (Vote 15-1; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 13, PG.235-236 | |
2011-02-01 | House Executive Session: 2/8/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2011-01-26 | House Public Hearing: 2/3/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2011-01-20 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 11, PG.179 |