NH HB248 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to operation of OHRVs on trail connectors in Coos and Grafton counties.
Title
Relative to operation of OHRVs on trail connectors in Coos and Grafton counties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 19 |
2017-02-06 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/15/2017 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 14 |
2017-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 01/31/2017 Legislative Office Building 305 |
2017-01-04 | House | Public Hearing: 01/11/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 |
2016-12-30 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 2 P. 21 |