NH HB248 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-18 - House II. Remainder Effective 07/14/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-18 - House II. Remainder Effective 07/14/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to study business regulations in New Hampshire.
Title
Establishing a commission to study business regulations in New Hampshire.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-18 | House II. Remainder Effective 07/14/2011 | |
2011-07-18 | House I. Section 2 Effective 10/31/2012 | |
2011-07-18 | House Law Without Signature 07/14/2011; Chapter 0263; NH Constitution, Art.44, Pt.II | |
2011-06-22 | House Enrolled; House Journal 57, PG.1860 | |
2011-06-22 | Senate Enrolled | |
2011-06-22 | House Enrolled Bill Amendment #2011-2528e Adopted; House Journal 57, PG.1859 | |
2011-06-22 | Senate Enrolled Bill Amendment #2528e Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2011-06-22 | House Conference Committee Report #2475c Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 57, PG.1840 | |
2011-06-22 | Senate Conference Committee Report 2475c; Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2011-06-16 | Senate Conference Committee Report #2011-2475c; Senate Amendment + New Amendment, Filed | |
2011-06-14 | House ==RECONVENE== Conference Committee Meeting: 6/15/2011 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-06-10 | House Conference Committee Meeting: 6/13/2011 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 ==RECESSED== | |
2011-06-08 | Senate President Appoints: Senators Sanborn, De Blois and Kelly; Senate Journal 20, Pg.567 | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Sen. Prescott Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference; Senate Journal 20, Pg.567 | |
2011-06-01 | House Speaker Appoints: Reps Hunt, Jennifer Coffey, Mirski, and Schlachman; House Journal 48, PG.1624 | |
2011-06-01 | House House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment #1834s, #1914s, and #2000s and Req C of C (Rep Hunt): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 48, PG.1624 | |
2011-05-18 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 17, Pg.357 | |
2011-05-18 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendments 1834s, 1914s, 2000s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 17, Pg.347 | |
2011-05-18 | Senate Sen. Merrill Floor Amendment #2011-2000s, Regular Calendar 17Y-7N, Amendment Adopted; Senate Journal 17, Pg.347 | |
2011-05-18 | Senate Sen. Houde Floor Amendment #2011-1914s, Regular Calendar 20Y-4N, Amendment Adopted; Senate Journal 17, Pg.346 | |
2011-05-18 | Senate Committee Amendment 1834s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 17, Pg.346 | |
2011-05-11 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-1834s, 5/18/11; Senate Calendar 24 | |
2011-04-28 | Senate Hearing: 5/3/11, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 22 | |
2011-04-20 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 14, Pg.272 | |
2011-03-15 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0738h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.697-698 | |
2011-03-15 | House Amendment #0738h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.697-698 | |
2011-03-09 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-0738h; House Calendar 23, PG.595 | |
2011-03-09 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0738h for Mar 15 (Vote 15-2; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.523 | |
2011-03-02 | House Executive Session: 3/9/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-02-24 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 3/1/2011 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-02-24 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/28/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-02-16 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 2/25/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-02-01 | House ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 2/22/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-01-26 | House ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 2/15/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-01-20 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 11, PG. 179 |