NH HB246 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/28/2017; Chapter 164; eff 01/01/18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/28/2017; Chapter 164; eff 01/01/18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to timber trespass.
Title
Relative to timber trespass.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/28/2017; Chapter 164; eff 01/01/18 |
2017-06-13 | House | Enrolled 06/08/2017 House Journal 18 P. 9 |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/08/2017); Senate Journal 20 |
2017-06-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2017-2034e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 149 |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2017-2034e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/31/2017); Senate Journal 19 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/18/2017; Senate Journal 17 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/18/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 23 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Hearing: 03/28/2017, Room 103, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 16 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Introduced 02/16/2017 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 7 |
2017-02-09 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/09/2017 House Journal 6 P. 6 |
2017-01-30 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/09/2017 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 7 |
2017-01-18 | House | Executive Session: 01/24/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 |
2017-01-04 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2016-12-30 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 2 P. 21 |