NH HB246 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 225-115; House Journal 16, PG. 326-328
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 225-115; House Journal 16, PG. 326-328
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to jury nullification.
Title
Relative to jury nullification.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Itse [R] | Rep. J.R. Hoell [R] | Rep. Richard Marple [R] | Rep. Paul Ingbretson [R] |
Rep. Max Abramson [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-11 - House - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 225 N: 115 NV: 54 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 225-115; House Journal 16, PG. 326-328 |
2015-02-11 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Hoell); House Journal 16, PG. 298 |
2015-02-05 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 11 (Vote 14-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar11, PG. 174-175 |
2015-02-04 | House | Executive Session: 2/4/2015 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2015-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 1/29/2015 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 12, PG. 214 |