NH HB246 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed By Governor 07/10/2013; Effective 07/10/2013; Chapter 0206
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed By Governor 07/10/2013; Effective 07/10/2013; Chapter 0206
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to falsity of reports by employers and unemployment benefits recipients.
Title
Relative to falsity of reports by employers and unemployment benefits recipients.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | House | Signed By Governor 07/10/2013; Effective 07/10/2013; Chapter 0206 |
2013-06-14 | House | Enrolled, Recess of 6/5/13; House Journal 49, PG.1654 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-05 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1601s(NT), #1727s, and #1798s (Rep A.White): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 49, PG.1563 |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 1601s, New Title, 1727s, 1798s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment #2013-1798s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment #2013-1727s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Withdrew Floor Amendment 1798s |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Reconsideration on Floor Amendment, 1798s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Withdrew Floor Amendment 1727s |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment #2013-1727s, Not Voted On |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment #2013-1798s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1601s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Without Objection Rule 3-17 is Suspended to Allow Non-Germane Amendment 1601s, New Title, 2/3 necessary, Motion Adopted; |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Chair Ruled Non-Germane Amendment |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-1601s, New Title, 5/30/13; Senate Calendar 22 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Without Objection, HB 246 is Special Ordered to the Next Session Day, 2/3 Necessary, Motion Adopted; |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-1601s, New Title, 5/23/13; Senate Calendar 21 |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Hearing: 4/23/13, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 17 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce |
2013-03-27 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 31, PG.1023 |
2013-03-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 27 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 25, PG.705 |
2013-03-07 | House | Executive Session: 3/14/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-03-07 | House | Public Hearing: 3/14/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-02-13 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 17, PG.330 |
2013-02-13 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 17, PG.330 |
2013-02-07 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 13 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 13, PG.210 |
2013-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 1/29/2013 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 1/22/2013 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services; House Journal 12, PG.188 |