NH HB244 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Repealing the moorings appeals board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repealing the moorings appeals board.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-02SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/15/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 22
2019-04-16SenateHearing: 05/01/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:40 am; Senate Calendar 19
2019-03-29SenateIntroduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 12
2019-03-19HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 30
2019-03-11HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/19/2019 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 11
2019-02-15HouseExecutive Session: 03/05/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305
2019-01-23HousePublic Hearing: 01/29/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 305
2018-12-27HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 2 P. 42

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback