NH HB244 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-19 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/2/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
Pending: House Commerce and Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-19 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/2/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
Pending: House Commerce and Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Restricting the collection of biometric data by state agencies and private entities.
Title
Restricting the collection of biometric data by state agencies and private entities.
Sponsors
Rep. Laura Jones [R] | Rep. Neal Kurk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-19 | House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/2/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2012-09-07 | House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/18/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 =Banking Div= | |
2012-06-07 | House Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs for Interim Study; House Calendar 45, PG.2432 | |
2012-01-11 | House Refer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Division Vote 174-131; House Journal 9, PG.580 | |
2012-01-04 | House Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Kurk); House Journal 7, PG.367 | |
2011-10-28 | House Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 4 (Vote 15-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 70, PG.2200 | |
2011-10-19 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/25/2011 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 301-303 (If Necessary Continued 10/27/2011 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302) | |
2011-10-19 | House Retained Bill - Banking/Business Div Subcom Work Session: 10/25/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-09-27 | House Retained Bill - Banking/Business Div Subcom Work Session: 10/18/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-06-22 | House Retained Bill - Banking/Business Div Subcom Work Session: 9/27/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-03-09 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.822 | |
2011-03-01 | House Executive Session: 3/9/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-02-16 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 2/25/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-02-01 | House Public Hearing: 2/22/2011 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-01-26 | House ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 2/15/2011 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-01-20 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 11, PG. 179 |