NH HB241 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-19 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/2/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
Pending: House Commerce and Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-19 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/2/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
Pending: House Commerce and Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to insurance coverage.
Title
Relative to insurance coverage.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Ball [R] | Rep. Spec Bowers [R] | Rep. Daniel Itse [R] | Rep. Dan McGuire [R] |
Rep. Lynne Ober [R] | Sen. Raymond White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-19 | House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/2/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2012-09-07 | House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/18/2012 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 307 ==Insurance Div== | |
2012-06-07 | House Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs for Interim Study; House Calendar 45, PG.2432 | |
2012-01-11 | House Refer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Division Vote 192-132; House Journal 9, PG.580 | |
2012-01-04 | House Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep D.McGuire); House Journal 7, PG.367 | |
2011-10-17 | House Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 4 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 70, PG.2200 | |
2011-09-27 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/6/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-08-23 | House Retained Bill - Insurance/Consumer Div Subcom Work Session: 9/13/2011 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-03-09 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.822 | |
2011-03-01 | House Executive Session: 3/9/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-01-26 | House Public Hearing: 2/3/2011 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-01-20 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 11, PG. 179 |