NH HB237 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB237
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-13 - Executive Session: 10/20/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203
Pending: House Criminal Justice and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-13 - Executive Session: 10/20/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203
Pending: House Criminal Justice and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the legalization and regulation of cannabis and making appropriations therefor.
Title
Relative to the legalization and regulation of cannabis and making appropriations therefor.
Sponsors
Rep. Casey Conley [D] | Rep. Rebecca McWilliams [D] | Rep. Wendy Chase [D] | Rep. Tony Labranche [D] |
Rep. Matthew Wilhelm [D] | Rep. Melbourne Moran [D] | Rep. Robert Cushing [D] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-13 | House | Executive Session: 10/20/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2021-09-28 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 10/05/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2021-09-20 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/28/2021 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2021-02-18 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 01/27/2021 11:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91386255102 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 2 P. 40 |
Same As/Similar To
HB237 (Carry Over) 2021-10-13 - Executive Session: 10/20/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203