NH HB236 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/23/2021; Chapter 133; Eff: 09/21/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/23/2021; Chapter 133; Eff: 09/21/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creating a statute of limitation on civil actions relative to damage caused by perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances.
Title
Creating a statute of limitation on civil actions relative to damage caused by perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances.
Sponsors
Rep. Suzanne Vail [D] | Rep. Sue Mullen [D] | Rep. Megan Murray [D] | Rep. Wendy Chase [D] |
Rep. Maureen Mooney [R] | Rep. Tony Labranche [D] | Rep. Bob Healey [R] | Rep. David Meuse [D] |
Sen. Rebecca Perkins Kwoka [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-26 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/23/2021; Chapter 133; Eff: 09/21/2021 |
2021-07-12 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021 |
2021-07-12 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-10 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2021-1695s (Rep. Gordon): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 12 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-1695s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/27/2021; Senate Journal 17 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2021-1695s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/27/2021; Senate Journal 17 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1695s, 05/27/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 25A |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 05/11/2021, 01:45 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 23 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Introduced 04/08/2021 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 12 |
2021-04-08 | House | Reconsider (Rep. McLean): Motion Failed DV 117-226 04/08/2021 House Journal 6 P. 110 |
2021-04-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/08/2021 House Journal 6 P. 106 |
2021-03-09 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2021-03-09 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 11-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 51 |
2021-03-02 | House | Executive Session: 03/02/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95501229688 |
2021-02-16 | House | Public Hearing: 02/16/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94907543326 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 40 |