NH HB236 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB236
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Remove from Table (Rep. Itse): Motion Failed DV 138-191 03/07/2018 House Journal 7 P. 22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Remove from Table (Rep. Itse): Motion Failed DV 138-191 03/07/2018 House Journal 7 P. 22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to determination of parental rights and responsibilities and establishing a presumption in favor of shared residential responsibility.
Title
Relative to determination of parental rights and responsibilities and establishing a presumption in favor of shared residential responsibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-03 - House - ITL (Y: 174 N: 175 NV: 15 Abs: 29) [FAIL]
2018-01-03 - House - OTPA (Y: 171 N: 178 NV: 15 Abs: 29) [FAIL]
2018-01-03 - House - OTPA (Y: 171 N: 178 NV: 15 Abs: 29) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | House | Remove from Table (Rep. Itse): Motion Failed DV 138-191 03/07/2018 House Journal 7 P. 22 |
2018-01-03 | House | Lay HB 236 on Table (Rep. Hinch): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 53 |
2018-01-03 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 174-175 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 51 |
2018-01-03 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2520h and 0004h: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 171-178 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 49 |
2018-01-03 | House | FLAM # 2018-0004h (Rep. Itse): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 48 |
2018-01-03 | House | Amendment # 2017-2520h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 47 |
2017-11-15 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2017-11-15 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-2520h for 01/03/2018 (Vote 8-6; Regular Calendar) |
2017-10-25 | House | Executive Session: 11/09/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-09-19 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/24/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-06-07 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/12/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-05-09 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 06/06/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-04-26 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 05/09/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-03-01 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Executive Session: 02/28/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-02-14 | House | Public Hearing: 02/21/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-01-09 | House | Vacated to Children and Family Law Without Objection 01/04/2017 House Journal 2 P. 15 |
2016-12-29 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 21 |
Same As/Similar To
HB236 (Carry Over) 2017-11-15 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate