NH HB236 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-28 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-28 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to child support and allowable child care expenses.
Title
Relative to child support and allowable child care expenses.
Sponsors
Rep. James Webb [R] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Oligny [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
Rep. Jack Flanagan [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - House - Ought to Pass Amended (Y: 191 N: 174 NV: 32 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-28 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 16 |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 5/28/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 23 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Hearing: 5/5/15, Room 100, State House, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 19 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0618h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 191-174; House Journal 24, PG. 822-825 |
2015-03-11 | House | Amendment #0618h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 822 |
2015-03-05 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2015-03-05 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0618h for Mar 11 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 412 |
2015-02-24 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2015-02-04 | House | Public Hearing: 2/17/2015 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Children and Family Law; House Journal 12, PG. 214 |