NH HB233 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-04 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 7, PG.423
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-04 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 7, PG.423
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Restricting judicial review of state education trust fund distributions.
Title
Restricting judicial review of state education trust fund distributions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 7, PG.423 | |
2011-10-25 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 4 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 70, PG.2209 | |
2011-09-14 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 9/27/2011 11:00 Amendment or Immediately Following Work Session Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2011-09-14 | House Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/27/2011 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2011-02-11 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.825 | |
2011-02-01 | House Executive Session: 2/11/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2011-01-25 | House Public Hearing: 2/4/2011 9:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2011-01-20 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Special Committee on Education Funding Reform; House Journal 11, PG. 178 |