NH HB231 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-17 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-17 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to applications for school building aid.
Title
Relative to applications for school building aid.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-17 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2015-11-12 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2509h for Jan 6 (Vote 13-7; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 17 |
2015-10-08 | House | Executive Session: 10/27/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-10-07 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/20/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-09-09 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/6/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-08-25 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/8/2015 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-08-17 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/25/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-05-12 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/26/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-05-06 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/19/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-02-05 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 2/5/2015 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 1/29/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Education; House Journal 12, PG. 213 |