NH HB231 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 12, Pg.249
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 12, Pg.249
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to payment of medical benefits for state retirees, their spouses, and dependents.
Title
Relative to payment of medical benefits for state retirees, their spouses, and dependents.
Sponsors
Rep. Neal Kurk [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-13 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - OTP/AM 0642H(NT) (Y: 188 N: 120 NV: 90 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-16 - House - OTP/AM 0642H(NT) (Y: 188 N: 120 NV: 90 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 12, Pg.249 | |
2011-04-07 | Senate Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 4/13/11; Senate Calendar 19 | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Hearing: 3/31/11, Room 100, State House, 10:20 a.m.; Senate Calendar 17 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 11, Pg.191 | |
2011-03-16 | House Reconsideration (Rep C.McGuire): Motion Failed Division Vote 93-215; House Journal 28, PG.940 | |
2011-03-16 | House Print Debate in Permanent Journal (Rep P.Garrity): Motion Failed Voice Vote; House Journal 28, PG.940 | |
2011-03-16 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0642h(NT): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 188-120; House Journal 28, PG.937-940 | |
2011-03-16 | House Amendment #0642h (New Title) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 28, PG.937-938 | |
2011-03-10 | House Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 22, PG.566-567 | |
2011-03-10 | House Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #2011-0642h (New Title); House Calendar 23, PG.593-594 | |
2011-03-10 | House Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0642h(NT) for Mar 15 (Vote 8-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.566-567 | |
2011-02-24 | House =RESCHEDULED= Executive Session: 3/4/2011 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201-203 | |
2011-02-23 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 2/28/2011 12:30 PM Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2011-02-23 | House Full Committee Work Session: 2/28/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2011-02-23 | House Public Hearing on Non-Germane Amendment #2011-0484h(NT): 2/28/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2011-02-23 | House Recommit (Rep Sedensky): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.497-498 | |
2011-02-16 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-0317h (New Title); House Calendar 15, PG.300-301 | |
2011-02-16 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0317h(NT) for Feb 23 (Vote 9-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 15, PG.279 | |
2011-02-08 | House Executive Session: 2/11/2011 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 201-203 | |
2011-01-25 | House Public Hearing: 2/4/2011 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201-203 ==ROOM CHANGE (Orig Legislative Office Building 205)== | |
2011-01-20 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Special Committee on Public Employee Pensions Reform; House Journal 11, PG. 178 |