NH HB228 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 12 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Enrolled 06/06/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Extending the commission to study the current statutes related to management of non-tidal public waterways and the construction or placement of structures within them and relative to the New Hampshire rivers management and protection program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extending the commission to study the current statutes related to management of non-tidal public waterways and the construction or placement of structures within them and relative to the New Hampshire rivers management and protection program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-12HouseEnrolled 06/06/2019
2019-06-12SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-05-23HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1880s (Rep. Suzanne Smith): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019
2019-05-15SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1880s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-15SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1880s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-09SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1880s, 05/15/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 22
2019-03-21SenateHearing: 03/26/2019, Room 103, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 15
2019-03-12SenateIntroduced 03/07/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 8
2019-02-14HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0131h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 21
2019-02-14HouseAmendment # 2019-0131h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 21
2019-01-31HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0131h for 02/14/2019 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 11
2019-01-23HouseExecutive Session: 01/29/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2019-01-08HousePublic Hearing: 01/22/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 305
2018-12-27HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 2 P. 42

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback