NH HB228 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off; Senate Journal 20
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to transportation of alcoholic beverages by a minor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to transportation of alcoholic beverages by a minor.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15SenateConference Committee Report; Not Signed Off; Senate Journal 20
2017-06-06HouseConference Committee Meeting: 06/08/2017 01:20 PM Legislative Office Building 204
2017-06-01SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Carson, French, Lasky; 05/31/2017; Senate Journal 18
2017-06-01SenateSen. Carson Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/31/2017; Senate Journal 18
2017-05-18HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps. Chandley, Gagne, Welch, Gargasz 05/18/2017 House Journal 16 P. 7
2017-05-18HouseHouse Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1403s and Requests CofC (Rep. Welch): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/18/2017 House Journal 16 P. 7
2017-04-20SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2017-1403s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14
2017-04-20SenateCommittee Amendment #2017-1403s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14
2017-04-13SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1403s, 04/20/2017; Senate Calendar 19
2017-03-29SenateHearing: 04/04/2017, Room 100, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 17
2017-03-07Senate==CANCELLED== Hearing: 03/14/2017, Room 100, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 14
2017-02-22SenateIntroduced 02/16/2017 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7
2017-01-26HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0038h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/26/2017 House Journal 4 P. 3
2017-01-26HouseAmendment #2017-0038h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/26/2017 House Journal 4 P. 3
2017-01-18HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0038h for 01/26/2017 (Vote 18-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 8 P. 3
2017-01-11HouseExecutive Session: 01/17/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204
2017-01-11HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 01/17/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2017-01-04HousePublic Hearing: 01/11/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2016-12-29HouseIntroduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 2 P. 21

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback