NH HB221 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-13 - House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/25/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-13 - House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/25/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a procedure for leasing state parks.
Title
Establishing a procedure for leasing state parks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-13 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/25/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-09-13 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/4/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-07-26 | House Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 8/9/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-02-09 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.825 | |
2011-01-26 | House Executive Session: 2/8/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-01-26 | House Public Hearing: 2/1/2011 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-01-19 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 11, PG. 177 |