NH HB218 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-16 - House Vetoed By Governor 06/15/2011; House Calendar 49, PG.1681
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-16 - House Vetoed By Governor 06/15/2011; House Calendar 49, PG.1681
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the New Hampshire rail transit authority.
Title
Relative to the New Hampshire rail transit authority.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Itse [R] | Rep. Dan McGuire [R] | Rep. Jon Richardson [R] | Rep. Gregory Sorg [R] |
Rep. Mark Warden [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-11 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Senate - Sen. Lambert Floor Amendment 1856s (Y: 9 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-11 - Senate - Committee Amendment 1773s (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - OTP (Y: 190 N: 119 NV: 89 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-11 - Senate - Sen. Lambert Floor Amendment 1856s (Y: 9 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-11 - Senate - Committee Amendment 1773s (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - OTP (Y: 190 N: 119 NV: 89 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-16 | House Vetoed By Governor 06/15/2011; House Calendar 49, PG.1681 | |
2011-06-08 | House Enrolled; House Journal 51, PG.1726 | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Enrolled | |
2011-06-01 | House House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1773s(NT) (Rep Packard): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 48, PG.1641 | |
2011-05-11 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 16 | |
2011-05-11 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1773s, New Title, Regular Calendar 16Y-8N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 16 | |
2011-05-11 | Senate Sen. Lambert Floor Amendment #2011-1856s, Regular Calendar 9Y-15N, Amendment Failed; Senate Journal 16 | |
2011-05-11 | Senate Committee Amendment 1773s, New Title, Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Amendment Adopted; Senate Journal 16 | |
2011-05-05 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-1773s, New Title, 5/11/11; Senate Calendar 23 | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Hearing: 3/31/11, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 11:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 17 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 11, Pg.191 | |
2011-03-17 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 190-119; House Journal 30, PG.989-991 | |
2011-02-22 | House Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 22, PG.569 | |
2011-02-22 | House Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 15 (Vote 11-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.569 | |
2011-02-16 | House Executive Session: 2/16/2011 1:45 PM Legislative Office Building 203 | |
2011-01-25 | House Public Hearing: 2/1/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 | |
2011-01-19 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Transportation; House Journal 11, PG. 177 |