NH HB216 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-22 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0680h
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-22 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0680h
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to public notice of and access to meetings under the right to know law.
Title
Relative to public notice of and access to meetings under the right to know law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0680h |
2021-03-22 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 11-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 75 |
2021-03-10 | House | Executive Session: 03/10/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95164452682 |
2021-03-02 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/02/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95501229688 |
2021-02-19 | House | Public Hearing: 02/19/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92168223794 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 39 |