NH HB216 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the mileage reimbursement rate for legislators and prohibiting deductions from compensation or mileage reimbursement of representatives.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the mileage reimbursement rate for legislators and prohibiting deductions from compensation or mileage reimbursement of representatives.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 18
2019-02-05HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/14/2019 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 8
2019-01-16HouseExecutive Session: 01/30/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 303
2019-01-16HousePublic Hearing: 01/24/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303
2018-12-27HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 2 P. 41

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback