NH HB216 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-28 - Sen. Bradley moved to Rerefer to Committee, Regular Calendar 14Y-7N, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to recovery of certain investigatory costs by regulatory boards and commissions, and applying certain general administration provisions to the mechanical licensing board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to recovery of certain investigatory costs by regulatory boards and commissions, and applying certain general administration provisions to the mechanical licensing board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-28 - Senate - Rerefer to Committee (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-28SenateSen. Bradley moved to Rerefer to Committee, Regular Calendar 14Y-7N, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 16
2015-05-28SenateSen. D'Allesandro Floor Amendment #2015-1967s, New Title, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 16
2015-05-28SenateSen. D'Allesandro Moved Ought to Pass
2015-05-28SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Failed, Voice Vote, Senate Journal 16
2015-05-21SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 5/28/15; Senate Calendar 23
2015-05-14SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 1600s, New Title, Regular Calendar 17Y-7N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; Senate Journal 14
2015-05-14SenateSen. Bradley Moved to Reconsider the following actions taken by this body: Rescind Order to the Committee on Finance, Vote on Ought to Pass with Amendment 1600s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14
2015-05-14SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 1600s, New Title, Regular Calendar 16Y-8N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; Senate Journal 14
2015-05-14SenateCommittee Amendment 1600s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote
2015-05-07SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1600s, New Title, 5/14/15; Senate Calendar 21
2015-04-09SenateSen. Bradley moved Rerefer to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote, Senate Journal 11
2015-04-09SenateSen. Sanborn Moved Laid on Table, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 11
2015-04-01SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/9/15; Senate Calendar 16
2015-03-25SenateHearing: 4/1/15, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 15
2015-03-19SenateIntroduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 10
2015-03-11HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 788
2015-03-05HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 11 (Vote 23-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 401
2015-03-03HouseExecutive Session: 3/5/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211
2015-02-20HouseDivision I Work Session: 3/2/2015 3:30 PM Legislative Office Building 212
2015-02-18HouseReferred to Finance
2015-02-18HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG. 513
2015-02-11HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 18 (Vote 15-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar13, PG. 246
2015-01-29HouseExecutive Session: 2/3/2015 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2015-01-26House==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/28/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306
2015-01-21House==POSTPONED== Public Hearing: 1/27/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306
2015-01-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 12, PG. 213

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback