NH HB216 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-10 - House Signed By the Governor 05/07/2010; Effective 01/01/2011; Chapter 0010

Summary

Relative to fees for legal services rendered to workers' compensation claimants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to fees for legal services rendered to workers' compensation claimants.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-10 House Signed By the Governor 05/07/2010; Effective 01/01/2011; Chapter 0010
2010-04-21 House Enrolled; House Journal 35, PG.1671
2010-04-21 Senate Enrolled
2010-04-14 House House Concurs with Senate Amendment #0178s (Rep Goley): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 32, PG.1587
2010-01-21 Senate Passed By Third Reading Resolution, Senate Journal 3, Pg.44
2010-01-21 Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0178s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg, Senate Journal 3, Pg.34
2010-01-21 Senate
2010-01-19 Senate Committee Report; Ought to Pass with Amendment 0178s, 1/21/10; Senate Calendar 3A, Pg.3
2009-06-03 Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote
2009-05-26 Senate Committee Report; Rereferred to Committee [06/03/09]; Senate Calendar 26
2009-04-09 Senate Hearing; April 14, 2009, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 8:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 19
2009-03-18 Senate Introduced and Referred to Commerce, Labor and Consumer Protection; Senate Journal 8, pg. 133
2009-02-18 House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0192h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 18, PG.449
2009-02-18 House Amendment #0192h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 18, PG.449
2009-02-12 House Proposed Amendment #0192h; House Calendar 14, PG.299
2009-02-12 House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0192h for Feb 18 Consent Calendar (vote 19-0); House Calendar 14, PG.265
2009-02-04 House Executive Session: 2/11/2009 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307
2009-01-14 House Public Hearing: 1/29/2009 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307
2009-01-07 House Introduced 1/7/2009 and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services; House Journal 8, PG.125

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback