NH HB215 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/18/2017; Chapter 235; I. Sec. 2 eff. 11/2/2018 ; II. Rem. eff. 7/18/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a commission to study the legalization, regulation, and taxation of marijuana.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a commission to study the legalization, regulation, and taxation of marijuana.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-20HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 07/18/2017; Chapter 235; I. Sec. 2 eff. 11/2/2018 ; II. Rem. eff. 7/18/2017
2017-07-05HouseEnrolled 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 27
2017-07-03SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/22/2017); Senate Journal 20
2017-06-22HouseConference Committee Report 2343c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 21
2017-06-22SenateConference Committee Report #2017-2343c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/22/2017; Senate Journal 20
2017-06-15SenateConference Committee Report Filed, #2017-2343c; 06/15/2017
2017-06-08HouseConference Committee Meeting: 06/14/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2017-06-08SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Carson, Gannon, Lasky; 06/08/2017; Senate Journal 19
2017-06-08SenateSen. Carson Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/08/2017; Senate Journal 19
2017-06-08HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps. Abrami, Burns, Theberge, Walz 06/08/2017 House Journal 18 P. 2
2017-06-08HouseHouse Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1978s and Requests CofC (Rep. Major): Motion Adopted DV 232-77 06/08/2017 House Journal 18 P. 2
2017-06-01SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2017-1978s, Regular Calendar 15Y-8N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/31/2017; Senate Journal 18
2017-06-01SenateCommittee Amendment #2017-1978s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/31/2017; Senate Journal 18
2017-05-25SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1978s, 05/31/2017; Senate Calendar 25
2017-04-05SenateHearing: 04/11/2017, Room 100, State House, 11:00 am; Senate Calendar 18
2017-03-14SenateIntroduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 9
2017-03-08HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 49
2017-02-15HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/08/2017 (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar)
2017-02-15HouseExecutive Session: 02/08/2017 Legislative Office Building 202
2017-01-25HousePublic Hearing: 02/01/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2016-12-30HouseIntroduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 2 P. 20

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback