NH HB211 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/30/2019; Senate Calendar 24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to inquiries by prospective employers concerning salary history.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to inquiries by prospective employers concerning salary history.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - House - OTPA (Y: 213 N: 139 NV: 29 Abs: 19) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/30/2019; Senate Calendar 24
2019-04-05SenateHearing: 04/11/2019, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; the committee will meet at 1:00 p.m. or 30 minutes following the end of session; Senate Calendar 17A
2019-03-12SenateIntroduced 03/07/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 8
2019-02-14HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0202h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 212-139 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 61
2019-02-14HouseAmendment # 2019-0202h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 61
2019-02-06HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-02-06HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0202h for 02/14/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 17
2019-01-29HouseExecutive Session: 02/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307
2019-01-15HousePublic Hearing: 01/23/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 304
2019-01-09House==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 01/16/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 307
2018-12-27HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 2 P. 41

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback