NH HB207 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-20 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.473
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-20 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.473
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the inspection and regulation of coin-operated amusement rides.
Title
Relative to the inspection and regulation of coin-operated amusement rides.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-20 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.473 |
2013-02-15 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 20 (Vote 16-0:RC); House Calendar 15, PG.271 |
2013-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 2/12/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-01-30 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/7/2013 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 1/22/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 12, PG.187 |