NH HB205 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB205
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-08 - Executive Session: 06/02/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-08 - Executive Session: 06/02/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
Summary
Relative to incarceration under a suspended sentence.
Title
Relative to incarceration under a suspended sentence.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Schapiro [D] | Rep. John Bordenet [D] | Sen. Daryl Abbas [R] | Rep. David Welch [R] |
Sen. Jay Kahn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | House | Executive Session: 06/02/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-05-02 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 06/02/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-01-10 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1 |
2021-11-15 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study HB205-FN 10/05/2021 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 6 |
2021-09-29 | House | Executive Session: 10/14/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2021-09-29 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 10/05/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2021-09-28 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 10/05/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2021-03-09 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Public Hearing: 03/03/2021 01:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/96477061090 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 2 P. 39 |
Same As/Similar To
HB205 (Carry Over) 2021-09-29 - Executive Session: 10/14/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=376&sy=2022&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2022&txtbillnumber=HB205 |