NH HB205 | 2017 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]


Relative to flying a drone above a correctional facility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Relative to flying a drone above a correctional facility.



2017-11-30HouseDied on Table
2017-03-08HouseLay on Table (Rep. Welch): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 66
2017-02-16HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2017-02-16HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0154h for 03/08/2017 (Vote 15-4; Regular Calendar)
2017-02-01HouseExecutive Session: 02/08/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2017-01-18HousePublic Hearing: 01/25/2017 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building 204
2016-12-30HouseIntroduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 2 P. 20

New Hampshire State Sources

Bill Comments